Drew v. Enterprise Leasing of Detroit, LLC

Plaintiff: Eric T Drew
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing of Detroit, LLC and Wendy Cloutier
Case Number: 4:2013cv11460
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Referring Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING the Report And Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge Dated February 27, 2015 38 , (2) Granting Defendant Enterprise's Motion to Dismiss 23 ), and (3) Dismissing Defendant Enterprise From the Case. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JCur)
May 1, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting And Adopting The Report And Recommendation Of The Magistrate Judge Dated April 7, 2015 41 And Dismissing Wendy Cloutier From The Case Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JCur)
April 8, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Granting 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Denying Without Prejudice 3 Application for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drew v. Enterprise Leasing of Detroit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric T Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing of Detroit, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Cloutier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]