Speet et al v. Schuette et al Featured Case

Defendant: Kevin Belk, Gregory Bauer, Bill Schuette and Grand Rapids, City of
Plaintiff: James Speet and Ernest Sims
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00972
Filed: September 13, 2011
 
Court: Michigan Western District Court
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Jonker
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER granting STIPULATION 31 dismissing Plaintiffs' remaining claims ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 22, 2013 31 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Plaintiffs' Remaining Claims by defendants Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of (Bloemers, Margaret)
September 5, 2013 30 MANDATE of USCA re appeal 28 affirming the district court's judgment (ald)
August 14, 2013 29 JUDGMENT of USCA re appeal 28 ordering that the district court's judgment is affirmed (ald)
October 2, 2012 CASE NUMBER 12-2213 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal 28 (mkc)
September 25, 2012 RECEIPT: USCA appeal fee re 28 by defendant Bill Schuette in the amount of $455.00, receipt number LN001513 (pjw)
September 24, 2012 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL re 27 by defendant Bill Schuette (Sherman, Ann)
September 13, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting STIPULATION 26 re Entry of Final Judgment on First and Third Counts of Complaint under Rule 54(B) and Entry of Permanent Injunction Barring Enforcement of MCL 760.167(1)(h); signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 10, 2012 26 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Entry of Final Judgment on First and Third Counts of Complaint under Rule 54(B) and Entry of Permanent Injunction Barring Enforcement of MCL 760.167(1)(h) by defendants Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of, Bill Schuette, plaintiffs Ernest Sims, James Speet (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Aukerman, Miriam)
August 24, 2012 25 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 5 motion for partial summary judgment ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 9, 2012 24 REPLY to response to motion 5 for partial summary judgment, supplemental briefing filed by Ernest Sims, James Speet (Aukerman, Miriam)
March 2, 2012 23 SUPPLEMENT re Brief in Support of a Motion, 6 by defendant Bill Schuette (Sherman, Ann)
March 2, 2012 22 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for partial summary judgment MOTION for permanent injunction MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for declaratory judgment 5 filed by Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of (Bloemers, Margaret)
February 24, 2012 21 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held 02/16/2012 before Judge Robert J. Jonker; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/24/2012 ; redaction request due 3/16/2012 (Court Reporter: Trexler, Glenda (517)819-0396)
February 21, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER re 5 ; further briefing due no later than 3/2/2012; and any response due no later than 3/9/2012; 5 will be taken under advisement ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 17, 2012 19 Featured Case (DISREGARD) ORDER re 5 ; further briefing due no later than 3/2/2012; and any response due no later than 3/9/2012; 5 will be taken under advisement ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) Modified text per chambers request on 2/21/2012 (ald).
February 16, 2012 18 MINUTES of motion hearing re 5 MOTION for partial summary judgment MOTION for permanent injunction MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for declaratory judgment filed by Ernest Sims, James Speet held before Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 8, 2011 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number 5 and 11 : motion hearing is set for 2/16/2012 at 3:30 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 7, 2011 16 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil)
December 1, 2011 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiffs Ernest Sims, James Speet (Aukerman, Miriam)
October 31, 2011 14 REPLY to response to motion 5 for Patial Summary Judgment filed by Ernest Sims, James Speet (Aukerman, Miriam)
October 20, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/7/2011 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 12/1/2011 ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, mil)
October 17, 2011 12 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for partial summary judgment MOTION for permanent injunction MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for declaratory judgment 5 filed by Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3, # 2 Exhibits 4-6)(Bloemers, Margaret) Modified double text on 10/18/2011 (elc).
October 17, 2011 11 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for partial summary judgment MOTION for permanent injunction MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for declaratory judgment 5 and Request for Summary Judgment for Non-Movant Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(F) filed by Bill Schuette (Sherman, Ann)
October 11, 2011 10 ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of(Bloemers, Margaret)
October 10, 2011 9 ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses by Bill Schuette(Sherman, Ann)
October 5, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Margaret P. Bloemers on behalf of defendants Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of (Bloemers, Margaret)
September 22, 2011 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Ernest Sims, James Speet re Brief in Support of a Motion, 6 , MOTION for partial summary judgment MOTION for permanent injunction MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for declaratory judgment 5 (Aukerman, Miriam)
September 21, 2011 7 SUMMONS returned executed; All Plaintiffs (Aukerman, Miriam)
September 16, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ann Maurine Sherman on behalf of defendant Bill Schuette (Sherman, Ann)
September 15, 2011 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION for partial summary judgment MOTION for permanent injunction MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for declaratory judgment 5 filed by Ernest Sims, James Speet (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Thompson v. City of Chicago)(Korobkin, Daniel)
September 15, 2011 5 MOTION for partial summary judgment ( responses due 10/17/2011;), MOTION for permanent injunction, MOTION for preliminary injunction, MOTION for declaratory judgment by plaintiffs Ernest Sims, James Speet; (Korobkin, Daniel)
September 14, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of, Bill Schuette and returned to attorney for plaintiff (kvt)
September 13, 2011 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Steinberg, Michael)
September 13, 2011 3 (DISREGARD) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Steinberg, Michael) Modified text on 9/13/2011. Phone call from attorney's office. They will correct and refile. (kw) Refiled as entry 4 . Modified text on 9/13/2011 (kw).
September 13, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael J. Steinberg on behalf of plaintiffs Ernest Sims, James Speet (Steinberg, Michael)
September 13, 2011 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Gregory Bauer, Kevin Belk, Grand Rapids, City of, Bill Schuette ; none provided (elc)
September 13, 2011 2 NOTICE that this electronically-filed case has been assigned to Judge Robert J. Jonker (elc)
September 13, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Stewart Korobkin on behalf of plaintiffs Ernest Sims, James Speet (Korobkin, Daniel)
September 13, 2011 FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiffs Ernest Sims, James Speet in the amount of $350, receipt number 0646-2037935 (Aukerman, Miriam)
September 13, 2011 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by James Speet, Ernest Sims (Attachments: # 1 Index Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Aukerman, Miriam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Speet et al v. Schuette et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Belk
Represented By: Margaret P. Bloemers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Bauer
Represented By: Margaret P. Bloemers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Schuette
Represented By: Ann Maurine Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Rapids, City of
Represented By: Margaret P. Bloemers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Speet
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Daniel Stewart Korobkin
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Sims
Represented By: Daniel Stewart Korobkin
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]