Mesaba Aviation, Inc. v. Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association et al

 
Case Number: 0:2005cv01857
Filed: August 17, 2005
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Presiding Judge: David S. Doty
Referring Judge: Susan R. Nelson
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2008 40 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (CLB)
August 24, 2006 39 TRANSCRIPT of Settlement Proceedings held on 8/3/06 before Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. Court Reporter: Jackie Watne Rolf. (11pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY. FILED UNDER SEAL. (akl)
August 9, 2006 38 JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal # 2 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice)(JMH)
August 8, 2006 37 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge David S Doty on 8/8/2006. (PJM)
August 8, 2006 36 Featured Case ORDER Vacating the Preliminary Injunction in its Entirety. Signed by Judge David S Doty on 8/8/2006. (PJM)
August 7, 2006 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. re 33 Stipulation of Dismissal Proposed Order (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 4, 2006 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. re 33 Stipulation of Dismissal Proposed Order (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 4, 2006 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Mesaba Aviation, Inc., Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 3, 2006 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson : Final Settlement Conference held on 8/3/2006. Case settled. (RJL)
June 16, 2006 31 NOTICE OF FINAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Settlement Conference set for 8/3/2006 09:30 AM in Minneapolis - in Chambers Suite 9E before Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson on 6/16/06. (JLB)
June 16, 2006 30 BENCH TRIAL NOTICE. Bench Trial set for 9/11/2006 09:00 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 14W before Senior Judge David S Doty. (PJM)
November 10, 2005 29 DISCLOSURES Rule 26(a)(1) by AMFA Local Union 33, AMFA Local Union 38, Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association, AFMa Local Union 5, O. V. Delle-Femine.(Dingle, Karen)
November 7, 2005 28 Featured Case ORDER re 27 Stipulation filed by Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association. Defendants' Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association ("AMFA"), et al. may file their Rule 26(a)1 Disclosures no later than November 9, 2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson on 11/7/05. (JLB)
November 4, 2005 27 STIPULATION to File Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association. (Dingle, Karen)
October 17, 2005 26 Featured Case PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2006. Discovery due by 4/1/2006. Motions (non-disp) due 4/15/06. Motions (disp) due by 5/1/2006. Ready for trial due by 9/1/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson on 10/17/05. (JMH) Modified on 10/18/2005 (jlb).
October 12, 2005 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/12/2005. (JMH)
October 3, 2005 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by AMFA Local Union 33, AMFA Local Union 38, Neil White, James Schafer, Mesaba Aviation, Inc., Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association, AFMa Local Union 5, O. V. Delle-Femine, Nathan Winch.(Forsgren, Matthew)
September 16, 2005 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. AMFA Local Union 33 served on 8/19/2005, answer due 9/8/2005; AMFA Local Union 38 served on 9/1/2005, answer due 9/21/2005; James Schafer served on 8/22/2005, answer due 9/11/2005; Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association served on 8/17/2005, answer due 9/6/2005; Nathan Winch served on 8/19/2005, answer due 9/8/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service AMFA# 2 Certificate of Service Nathan Winch# 3 Certificate of Service James Schafer# 4 Certificate of Service AMFA Local 33# 5 Certificate of Service AMFA Local 38)(Forsgren, Matthew)
September 15, 2005 22 REPLY to Counterclaim by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Forsgren, Matthew)
September 6, 2005 21 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2005 02:45 PM In Chambers Suite 9E Hearing before Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R Nelson on 9/6/05. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(JLB)
August 31, 2005 20 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Mesaba Aviation, Inc. by Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Granath, Nicholas)
August 24, 2005 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas P Granath on behalf of all defendants (Attachments: # 1Certificate of Service)(Granath, Nicholas) Modified text on 8/25/2005 (JMH).
August 22, 2005 18 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for TRO held on 8/19/05 before Judge David S Doty. Court Reporter: Lorilee K Fink. (55pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE 8/22/05. (jam)
August 22, 2005 17 Featured Case ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF REALTED CASES. That case No 05-1878 be assigned to Judge Doty and Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson,nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge David S Doty on 8/22/05, by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 8/22/05. (MKC)
August 22, 2005 DOCUEMTN FILED IN ERROR - WILL RE-FILE TRANSCRIPT of Motion for TRO held on 8/19/05 before Judge David S Doty. Court Reporter: Lorilee K Fink. (55pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE 8/22/05. (jam) Modified text on 8/23/2005 (jam).
August 19, 2005 16 NOTICE by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. of Executed Bond for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 19, 2005 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc., (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge David S Doty on 8/19/05. (PJM)
August 19, 2005 14 Featured Case DOCUMENT REMOVED - DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR -- ORDER granting 2 Motion for TRO (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge David S Doty on 8/19/05. (PJM) Modified on 8/19/2005 (LJG). Modified on 8/22/2005 (mkc).
August 19, 2005 13 (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S Doty : Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2005 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. - argued, submitted and taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (CLB)
August 18, 2005 12 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by all defendants re 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by all defendants. (Dingle, Karen)
August 18, 2005 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Wade Slagle Declaration# 2 Exhibit Nathan Winch Declaration# 3 Exhibit James Schafer Declaration# 4 Exhibit Neil White Declaration)(Dingle, Karen)
August 18, 2005 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. of MAIR Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 18, 2005 9 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. re 4 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. re 4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 5 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 6 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, 3 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 7 AFFIDAVIT of Cynthia M. Surrisi in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index# 2 Exhibit A)(Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 6 AFFIDAVIT of Scott Bussell in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index# 2 Exhibit A - D)(Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 5 AFFIDAVIT of William T. Poerstel in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index# 2 Exhibit A - G)(Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 3 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2005 09:30 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 14W before Senior Judge David S Doty. (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Mesaba Aviation, Inc.. (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 17, 2005 Summons Issued as to Neil White, James Schafer, Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association, AMFA Local Unions 5, 33, and 38, O. V. Delle-Femine, Nathan Winch. (JMH)
August 17, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Neil White, James Schafer, Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association, AMFA Local Unions 5, 33, and 38, O. V. Delle-Femine, Nathan Winch ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 436916.) assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson 4:05AD766, filed by Mesaba Aviation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3 Cover Letter (4) Exhibits B-E)(JMH) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2005 (vem).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mesaba Aviation, Inc. v. Aircraft Mechanics Fraternal Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]