Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC v. McGladrey & Pullen, LLP Featured Case

Plaintiff: Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC
Defendant: McGladrey & Pullen, LLP
 
Case Number: 0:2008cv05370
Filed: October 6, 2008
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Noel
Presiding Judge: Tunheim
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2009 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal VOLUNTARY by Belmont Strategic Income Fund, LP, Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC, McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jarpe, Geoffrey)
January 20, 2009 22 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 1/17/09. (akl)
January 20, 2009 21 Featured Case PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: (Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2009, Discovery due by 12/1/2009, Motions (non-disp) due 3/1/2010, Motions (disp) due by 5/1/2010, Ready for trial due by 7/1/2010). Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 1/17/09. (akl)
January 16, 2009 20 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Belmont Strategic Income Fund, LP, Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC, McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jarpe, Geoffrey)
January 16, 2009 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/2009. (akl)
January 6, 2009 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Belmont Strategic Income Fund, LP, Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC, McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jarpe, Geoffrey)
December 22, 2008 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph M Terry for McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. Fee paid; receipt number 4-029241. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/22/08. (MMC)
December 19, 2008 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP re 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joseph M. Terry (Shroyer, Thomas)
December 19, 2008 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joseph M. Terry by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Shroyer, Thomas)
December 8, 2008 15 NOTICE OF ( Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2009 09:00 AM in Minneapolis - Suite 9W before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/8/08. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(RLR)
December 5, 2008 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Turner, Katherine)
December 5, 2008 13 Defendant McGladrey & Pullen, LLP's ANSWER to Amended Complaint by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Turner, Katherine)
November 13, 2008 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 8 , 9 , 10 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Thomas H L Selby, Steven M Farina and Katherine M Turner for McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. Fees paid; receipt number 4-028327.Approved by Clerk Richard D Sletten on 11/13/08. (MMC)
November 12, 2008 12 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant McGladrey & Pullen, LLP, to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint in the above-entitled action is extended up to and including December 5, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 11/10/08. (akl)
November 12, 2008 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP re 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Steven M. Farina, 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Katherine M. Turner, 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas H.L. Selby (Shroyer, Thomas)
November 12, 2008 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Katherine M. Turner by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Shroyer, Thomas)
November 12, 2008 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Steven M. Farina by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Shroyer, Thomas)
November 12, 2008 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas H.L. Selby by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (Shroyer, Thomas)
November 3, 2008 7 STIPULATION re 5 Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Respond by all parties. (Shroyer, Thomas) Modified text on 11/4/2008 (RLR).
October 27, 2008 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Belmont Strategic Income Fund, LP, Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Jarpe, Geoffrey)
October 23, 2008 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against all defendants, filed by Belmont Strategic Income Fund, LP, Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E1, # 6 Exhibit(s) E2, # 7 Affidavit of Service) (Jarpe, Geoffrey)
October 10, 2008 4 DOCUMENT REMOVED FILED IN WRONG CASE. Modified on 10/10/2008 (jam).
October 7, 2008 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC. McGladrey & Pullen, LLP served on 10/6/2008, answer due 10/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Weinstine, Robert)
October 6, 2008 Summons Issued as to McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. (akl)
October 6, 2008 2 AFFIDAVIT of Geoffrey P. Jarpe by Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2)(akl)
October 6, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against McGladrey & Pullen, LLP, filed by Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4027335) Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (akl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC v. McGladrey & Pullen, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellerbrock Family Trust, LLC
Represented By: Robert R Weinstine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGladrey & Pullen, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]