Hubbell v. Better Business Bureau of Minnesota et al

Defendant: Better Business Bureau of Minnesota and Anne Gallagher
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Hubbell
 
Case Number: 0:2009cv01173
Filed: May 19, 2009
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Nelson
Presiding Judge: Rosenbaum
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2009 22 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based on the foregoing, and all the files, records, and proceedings herein, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Defendant Anne Gallagher Doc. No. 15 be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/15/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson on 11/30/2009. (MMP)
December 21, 2009 23 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 22 Report and Recommendation; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Anne Gallagher. Signed by Judge James M. Rosenbaum on 12/21/2009. (HLW)
May 10, 2010 32 Featured Case ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/10/10. (kll)
December 27, 2010 77 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 66 Motion to Strike Pleading (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/27/2010. (PJM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hubbell v. Better Business Bureau of Minnesota et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Business Bureau of Minnesota
Represented By: Gina K Janeiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Gallagher
Represented By: Gina K Janeiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Hubbell
Represented By: David W Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]