Block et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Angela Block
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Calty Design Research, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Kentucky, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. and Brooklyn Park Motors, Inc.
 
Case Number: 0:2010cv02802
Filed: June 30, 2010
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jeffrey J. Keyes
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 159 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 130 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 135 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/18/2014. (TLU)
December 23, 2010 51 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 19 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand; all claims against Brooklyn Park Motors are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/23/2010. (TLU)
February 28, 2011 74 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider; DENIED as to reconsideration and GRANTED as to entry of final judgment, and there being no just cause for delay, the Court pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Ru les of Civil Procedure directs the Clerk to enter final judgment in favor of Brooklyn Park Motors and against Plaintiff on all claims dismissed in the Courts Order dated December 23, 2010 51 (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 02/28/2011. (TLU)
June 13, 2011 94 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying (70) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting (86) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:10-cv-02803-ADM -AJB; denying (64) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting (81) Motion to Alter/ Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:10-cv-02802-ADM -AJB; denying (83) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part (86) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting (108) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; g ranting (111) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; granting (143) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:10-cv-02804-ADM -AJB; denying (64) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting (85) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:10-cv-02805-ADM -AJB (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/13/2011. Associated Cases: 0:10-cv-02802-ADM -AJB, 0:10-cv-02803-ADM -AJB, 0:10-cv-02804-ADM -AJB, 0:10-cv-02805-ADM -AJB(TLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Block et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Block
Represented By: Paige J Donnelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Bard D Borkon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calty Design Research, Inc.
Represented By: Bard D Borkon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering and Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Bard D Borkon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Manufacturing, Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Bard D Borkon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bard D Borkon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooklyn Park Motors, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]