Avery Dennison Corporation v. 3M Company et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Avery Dennison Corporation
Defendant: 3M Company and 3M Innovative Properties Company
Case Number: 0:2011cv00284
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Davis
Referring Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 31 , 32 , 33 , 34 , 35 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Daniel M. Flores, Samuel G. Liversidge, M. Sean Royall,Gavin S. Martinson and Daniel S. Floyd for 3M Company and 3M Innovative Properties Company. Fees paid; receipt numbers 0864-2734226, 0864-2734254, 0864-2734271, 0864-2734282, 0864-2734293. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/7/11. (MMC)
March 7, 2011 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company re 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Flores. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734226, 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel S. Floyd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734293, 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Samuel G. Liversidge. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734254, 33 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for M. Sean Royall. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734271, 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gavin S. Martinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734282 (Adkisson, John)
March 7, 2011 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel S. Floyd. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734293 by 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Adkisson, John)
March 7, 2011 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gavin S. Martinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734282 by 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Adkisson, John)
March 7, 2011 33 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for M. Sean Royall. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734271 by 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Adkisson, John)
March 7, 2011 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Samuel G. Liversidge. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734254 by 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Adkisson, John)
March 7, 2011 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Flores. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-2734226 by 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Adkisson, John)
February 23, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 24 , 25 , 26 , 27 , 28 , 29 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys James E. Baker,Aaron J. Bergstrom,David L. Bilsker,Charles K. Verhoeven,Emily C. O'Brien and Christopher E. Stretch for Avery Dennison Corporation. Fees paid; receipt number 4-052455.Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 2/23/11. (MMC)
February 22, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Chief Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan are no longer assigned to this case. Note: the new case number is 11cv284 MJD/FLN. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/22/11. (JMH)
February 22, 2011 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christopher E. Stretch by Avery Dennison Corporation. (Friedemann, Lora)
February 22, 2011 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Emily C. O'Brien by Avery Dennison Corporation. (Friedemann, Lora)
February 22, 2011 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles K. Verhoeven by Avery Dennison Corporation. (Friedemann, Lora)
February 22, 2011 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Bilsker by Avery Dennison Corporation. (Friedemann, Lora)
February 22, 2011 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Aaron J. Bergstrom by Avery Dennison Corporation. (Friedemann, Lora)
February 22, 2011 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James E. Baker by Avery Dennison Corporation. (Friedemann, Lora)
February 22, 2011 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Lora Mitchell Friedemann on behalf of Avery Dennison Corporation. (Friedemann, Lora)
February 9, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes recused. Case reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv284 SRN/AJB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/9/11. (JMH)
February 4, 2011 21 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv284 (SRN/JJK). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 2/4/11. (JMH)
February 3, 2011 20 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:10-cv-07931. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham per Antitrust List.
February 2, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 12 3m'S Motion to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota. (Attachments: # 1 CV-22) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
January 24, 2011 18 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota 12 filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
January 10, 2011 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota 12 filed by Plaintiff Avery Dennison Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(O'Brien, Emily) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
December 13, 2010 16 DECLARATION of Gerald L. Karel in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota 12 filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
December 13, 2010 15 DECLARATION of Mary Jo Abler in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota 12 filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
December 13, 2010 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota 12 filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
December 13, 2010 13 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Floyd in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota 12 filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T)(Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
December 13, 2010 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. Motion set for hearing on 2/7/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a))(Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
December 13, 2010 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company, identifying 3M Financial Management Company. (Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
December 13, 2010 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company.(Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
November 12, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: Exparte Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney M Sean Royall on behalf of Defendants 3M Company and 3M Innovative Properties Company, designating Daniel S Floyd as local counsel 7 GRANTED. (ir) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
November 10, 2010 8 FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 3M Innovative Properties Company answer now due 12/13/2010; 3M Company answer now due 12/13/2010, filed by Defendants 3M Innovative Properties Company; 3M Company.(Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
November 10, 2010 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION for attorney M. Sean Royall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, # 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Supplement Copy of check in payment of fee)(Flores, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
November 8, 2010 6 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to Section 3.1 of General Order 08-05. ORDER case transferred from Judge A. Howard Matz to the calendar of Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 10-07931 MRP(RZx). Signed by Judge A. Howard Matz and Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
October 28, 2010 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Avery Dennison Corporation, re Order, 4 on 3M Company and 3M Innovative Properties Company served on 10/25/2010. (O'Brien, Emily) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
October 25, 2010 4 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MATZ: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve this Order on all defendant and/or their counsel along with the summons and complaint, or if that is not practicable as soon as possible thereafter. If this case was assigned to this Court after being removed from State Court, the defendant who removed the case shall serve this Order on all other parties. (kbr) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
October 22, 2010 3 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Avery Dennison Corporation, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 10/21/2010, answer due 11/12/2010; 3M Innovative Properties Company served on 10/21/2010, answer due 11/12/2010. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (O'Brien, Emily) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
October 21, 2010 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Avery Dennison Corporation. (et) (ds). [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
October 21, 2010 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]
October 21, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, 3M Innovative Properties Company. Case assigned to Judge A. Howard Matz for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Ralph Zarefsky. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Avery Dennison Corporation. (et) (ds). [Transferred from California Central on 2/3/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery Dennison Corporation v. 3M Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Dennison Corporation
Represented By: David L Bilsker
Represented By: Aaron J Bergstrom
Represented By: James E Baker
Represented By: Lora Mitchell Friedemann
Represented By: Kurt J Niederluecke
Represented By: Emily C O'Brien
Represented By: Christopher E Stretch
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: John C Adkisson
Represented By: Daniel M Flores
Represented By: Daniel S Floyd
Represented By: Samuel G Liversidge
Represented By: Gavin S Martinson
Represented By: M Sean Royall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Innovative Properties Company
Represented By: John C Adkisson
Represented By: Daniel M Flores
Represented By: Daniel S Floyd
Represented By: Samuel G Liversidge
Represented By: Gavin S Martinson
Represented By: M Sean Royall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]