Afremov v. Jarayan et al

Plaintiff: Michael Afremov
Defendant: Artur Jarayan and Object of Vertu, LLC
 
Case Number: 0:2011cv00313
Filed: February 8, 2011
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 146 Featured Case FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT: granting Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 141 Motion for Default Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/24/12. (LPH)
October 24, 2012 147 Featured Case ORDER : 1. Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 121] is GRANTED; 2. The Amended Third-Party Complaint is dismissed in its entirety on the merits and with prejudice; and 3. Third-Party Defendant's Motion for Defau lt Judgment and for Attorney's Fees as to Third-Party Plaintiffs [Doc. No. 137] is DENIED AS MOOT in part as to default judgment, and DENIED in part as to the request for attorney's fees (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/24/12. (LPH)
January 13, 2014 178 Featured Case ORDER re 174 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1. Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge Rau's November 26, 2013 Report and Recommendation to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause [Doc. No. 175] are OVERRULED in part and SUSTAINED in part; 2. The Court ADOPTS in part, and DECLINES to adopt in part, the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. 174]; 3. Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Artur Jarayan Should Not Be Held in Contempt of Court for Violating the Court's July 26, 2012 Receivership Order [Doc. No. 150] is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part, as detailed herein; and 4. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Jarayan via email by the end of the day on January 17, 2014 (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/13/14. (LPH)
March 28, 2012 66 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint [Doc. No. 33] is GRANTED IN PART (insofar as it seeks dismissal of a part of Count One, the part of Count Two Plaintiff c hallenges, and Counts Five, and Seven), DENIED IN PART (insofar as it seeks to dismiss the other part of Count One, as well as Counts Eight and Nine, to clarify the pleadings, and to strike certain allegations) and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART (insofar a s it seeks to dismiss the original Third-Party Complaint); and 2. Third-Party Defendant John Atzbach's motion to dismiss the Third-Party Complaint [Doc. No. 36] is DENIED (without prejudice to its renewal if Third-Party Plaintiffs are unable to substantiate their claim for contribution or indemnity). (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/28/12. (LPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Afremov v. Jarayan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Afremov
Represented By: Sandra K Kensy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artur Jarayan
Represented By: John D Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Object of Vertu, LLC
Represented By: John D Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]