North Dakota, State of et al v. Swanson et al

Defendant: Phyllis Reha, J. Dennis O'Brien, Betsy Wergin, Mike Rothman, Lori Swanson, Ellen Anderson and David C. Boyd
Plaintiff: Missouri River Basin Municipal Power Agency, Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., North Dakota, State of, Industrial Commission of North Dakota, Lignite Energy Council, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, North American Coal Corporation, The and Great Northern Properties Limited Partnership
Case Number: 0:2011cv03232
Filed: November 2, 2011
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER : 1. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 128] is DENIED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART, as set forth in the order; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 135] is GRANTED IN PAR T and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART, as set forth in the order; 3. Defendants and their successors in office are hereby enjoined from enforcing Minn. Stat. § 216H.03, subd. 3(2)-(3); 4. Plaintiffs are not awarded their attorneys' fees incurred in this action; and 5. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Demand for a Jury Trial, Amend the Scheduling Order, and Set the Case for a Trial to the Court [Doc. No. 123] is DENIED AS MOOT (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/18/14. (LPH)
December 15, 2014 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 239 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs. See Order for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Nontaxable Costs. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/15/14. (SMD)
September 30, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 09/30/2012. (BML)
February 15, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1. Movants' Objections [Doc. No. 67] to the Magistrate Judge's December 21, 2012 Order [Doc. No. 63] are OVERRULED; 2. Defendants' Objections [Doc. No. 70] to the Magistrate Judge's December 12, 2012 Order [Doc. No. 63] are OVERRULED; 3. The Magistrate Judge's December 12, 2012 Order [Doc. No. 63] is AFFIRMED; and 4. Movants' Motion to Permissively Intervene in the action [Doc. No. 33] is DENIED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/15/13. (LPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Dakota, State of et al v. Swanson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Reha
Represented By: Jeanne M Cochran
Represented By: John S Garry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dennis O'Brien
Represented By: Jeanne M Cochran
Represented By: John S Garry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Wergin
Represented By: Jeanne M Cochran
Represented By: John S Garry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Rothman
Represented By: Jeanne M Cochran
Represented By: John S Garry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Swanson
Represented By: Jeanne M Cochran
Represented By: John S Garry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Anderson
Represented By: Jeanne M Cochran
Represented By: John S Garry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Boyd
Represented By: Jeanne M Cochran
Represented By: John S Garry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri River Basin Municipal Power Agency
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: William Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: David-NA Sogard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota, State of
Represented By: Wayne K Stenehjem
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Commission of North Dakota
Represented By: Wayne K Stenehjem
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lignite Energy Council
Represented By: Sandra Tabor
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Casey Jacobson
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: Claire M. Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Coal Corporation, The
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Thomas-NA Koza
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Represented By: John-NA Neumann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Properties Limited Partnership
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Wyatt-NA Hogan
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: John A Knapp
Represented By: Brent A Lorentz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]