Life Share Collateral Holdings, LLC v. Albers et al

Defendant: Reginald Barnes, Sterling Hariss, Ronald Albers and Raymond Byron Whitaker
Plaintiff: Life Share Collateral Holdings, LLC
 
Case Number: 0:2011cv03605
Filed: December 14, 2011
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joan N. Ericksen
Referring Judge: Jeffrey J. Keyes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER RE: Jurisdiction(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on December 19, 2011. (slf)
August 23, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER RE: Jurisdiction (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on August 23, 2012. (slf) cc: Raymond Byron Whitaker. Modified on 8/23/2012 (lmb).
November 9, 2012 65 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant Volios Group, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint 50 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE against defendant Volios Group, LLC. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on November 9, 2012. (CBC)
July 2, 2013 77 Featured Case ORDER denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on July 1, 2013. (CBC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Life Share Collateral Holdings, LLC v. Albers et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Barnes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Hariss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Albers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Byron Whitaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Share Collateral Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Thomas H Schaefer
Represented By: Adam-NA M. Simon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]