Honeywell International, Inc. v. Nest Labs, Inc. et al Featured Case

Counter_defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Nest Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Honeywell International, Inc.
Defendant: Nest Labs, Inc., Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P. and Bestbuy.com, LLC
 
Case Number: 0:2012cv00299
Filed: February 6, 2012
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 21 Honeywell International's REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant Nest Labs, Inc. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Liebman, Kenneth)
April 23, 2012 20 Featured Case LETTER & ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2012 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 4/23/12. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(jam)
April 13, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY-ORDER granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erin C Jones for Best Buy Co., Inc.,Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC., Nest Labs, Inc.. Fee paid; receipt number 0864-3151497. Approved by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 04/13/2012. (MAP)
April 13, 2012 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC. (Florey, Michael)
April 13, 2012 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Erin C. Jones. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3151497 by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC, Nest Labs, Inc.. (Florey, Michael)
April 12, 2012 17 Nest Labs, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Honeywell International, Inc. by Nest Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Pogue NYTimes Review, # 2 Exhibit(s) B - Boehret WSJ Review, # 3 Exhibit(s) C - Manjoo NYTimes Review, # 4 Exhibit(s) D - Baig USA Today, # 5 Exhibit(s) E - EP1065079A2 Volkswagon) (Florey, Michael)
March 21, 2012 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Bestbuy.com, LLC served on 3/21/2012, answer due 4/11/2012. (Liebman, Kenneth)
March 21, 2012 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Best Buy Stores, L.P. served on 3/21/2012, answer due 4/11/2012. (Liebman, Kenneth)
March 21, 2012 14 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-FILED FOR INCORRECT PARTY-WILL REFILE. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Best Buy Stores, L.P. served on 3/21/2012, answer due 4/11/2012. (Liebman, Kenneth) Modified text on 3/21/2012 (lmb).
March 20, 2012 Amended Summons Issued as to Best Buy Stores, L.P., Bestbuy.com, LLC. (kt)
March 20, 2012 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Best Buy Co., Inc., Nest Labs, Inc., filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) '504, # 2 Exhibit(s) '948, # 3 Exhibit(s) '958, # 4 Exhibit(s) '899, # 5 Exhibit(s) '789, # 6 Exhibit(s) '790, # 7 Exhibit(s) '988) (Liebman, Kenneth)
March 2, 2012 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Nest Labs, Inc.. (Goter, Phillip)
March 2, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER That the time within which Defendants, Nest Labs, Inc. and Best Buy Co., Inc., must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including April 13, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 03/02/2012. (jz)
March 2, 2012 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Goter, Phillip)
March 2, 2012 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip W. Goter on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Nest Labs, Inc.. (Goter, Phillip)
March 2, 2012 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Best Buy Co., Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Nest Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Florey, Michael)
March 2, 2012 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Florey on behalf of Best Buy Co., Inc., Nest Labs, Inc.. (Florey, Michael)
February 10, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY-ORDER granting 5 6 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Nina Y Wang,Joel D Sayres for Honeywell International, Inc.. Fees paid; receipt number 4-62113. Approved by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 02/10/2012. (MAP)
February 7, 2012 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Joel D. Sayres by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Johnson, Andrew)
February 7, 2012 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nina Y. Wang by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Johnson, Andrew)
February 7, 2012 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 2/6/2012, answer due 2/27/2012. (Johnson, Andrew)
February 7, 2012 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Nest Labs, Inc. served on 2/6/2012, answer due 2/27/2012. (Johnson, Andrew)
February 6, 2012 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Honeywell International, Inc. (MMP)
February 6, 2012 Summons Issued as to Best Buy Co., Inc., and Nest Labs, Inc. (MMP)
February 6, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Best Buy Co., Inc., Nest Labs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 62026.) assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Patent referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Filed by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Honeywell International, Inc. v. Nest Labs, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew F Johnson
Represented By: Randall E Kahnke
Represented By: Kenneth A Liebman
Represented By: Joel D Sayres
Represented By: Nina Y Wang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nest Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Florey
Represented By: Phillip W. Goter
Represented By: Erin C Jones
Represented By: Howard-NA G Pollack
Represented By: Frank-NA E Scherkenbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Nina Y Wang
Represented By: Joel D Sayres
Represented By: Kenneth A Liebman
Represented By: Randall E Kahnke
Represented By: Andrew F Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nest Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Florey
Represented By: Phillip W. Goter
Represented By: Erin C Jones
Represented By: Howard-NA G Pollack
Represented By: Frank-NA E Scherkenbach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Florey
Represented By: Phillip W. Goter
Represented By: Erin C Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Michael E Florey
Represented By: Erin C Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestbuy.com, LLC
Represented By: Michael E Florey
Represented By: Erin C Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]