Key Medical Supply, Inc. v. Sebelius et al

Plaintiff: Key Medical Supply, Inc.
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius and Marilyn Tavenner
Case Number: 0:2012cv00752
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Donovan W. Frank
Referring Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. 1. Key Medical Supply, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. 2 ) is respectfully DENIED. 2. Consistent with the Court's remarks off the bench at the hearing on this matter, the Court's Calendar Clerk will contact the parties to set a status conference that will focus on scheduling and discovery issues.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/30/2012. (BJS)
February 26, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM. 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Doc. No. 29 ) is GRANTED. 2. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Administrative Record (Doc. No. 29 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. Plaintiff's Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. 70 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/26/2013. (BJS)
March 19, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Doc. No. 29 ) is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief (Doc. No. 1 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 3. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on the Administrative Record (Doc. No. 29 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. 4. Plaintiff's Second Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. 70 ) is DENIED AS MOOT.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/19/2013. (BJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key Medical Supply, Inc. v. Sebelius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Key Medical Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel D Orbovich
Represented By: Lousene M Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: Clifford Lee Reeves, II
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Tavenner
Represented By: Clifford Lee Reeves, II
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.