Alexander v. Jensen-Carter

Defendant: G. Yvonne Stephens and Andrew Will Alexander
Appellant: Larry Kenneth Alexander
Appellee: Mary Jo A Jensen-Carter
 
Case Number: 0:2012cv01424
Filed: June 14, 2012
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Motion for Attorney Fees (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on August 16, 2012. (DML)
October 4, 2012 20 Featured Case AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER affirming May 10, 2012 Order of the Bankruptcy Court. (Only Change to 11 Order is docket number 12-1144 corrected to 12-424 for Larry Kenneth Alexander v. Mary Jo A. Jensen-Carter case.) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on August 16, 2012. (DML)
March 12, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 13 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 9011 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure ORDER denying (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on March 12, 2013. (DML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alexander v. Jensen-Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Yvonne Stephens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Will Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Larry Kenneth Alexander
Represented By: Daniel L M Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary Jo A Jensen-Carter
Represented By: Michael J Iannacone, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]