Okeayainneh v. Star Tribune Media Company, LLC et al

Defendant: David Chanen, Star Tribune Media Company, LLC and Dan Browning
Plaintiff: Julian Okeayainneh
 
Case Number: 0:2012cv02200
Filed: August 30, 2012
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Sherburne
Referring Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Schiltz
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; adopting Report and Recommendation 10 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on November 16, 2012. (clg) CC: JULIAN OKEAYAINNEH on 11/16/2012 (MMP).
December 5, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Reconsider. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff Julian Okeayainneh's motion to reconsider 15 is GRANTED. 2. The judgment entered on November 16, 2012 13 is VACATED. 3. The order of November 16, 2012 12 is VACATED. 4. The case is remanded to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron for further proceedings in light of this order. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on December 5, 2012. (clg) CC: Julian Okeayainneh on 12/5/2012 (MMP).
December 6, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 61 granting 46 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on December 6, 2013. (CLG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Okeayainneh v. Star Tribune Media Company, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chanen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Tribune Media Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Browning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Okeayainneh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]