Smith v. Questar Capital Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James W. Smith, Jr.
Defendant: Questar Capital Corporation, Yorktown Financial Companies, Inc. and Allianz Life Insurance Companies of North America
Case Number: 0:2012cv02669
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: Minnesota District Court
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Tony N. Leung
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint [Doc. No. 16] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART consistent with this Order: 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 3, 6, and 7 of the Class Action Complaint alleging violations of the Minnesota Securities Act is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 4 of the Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligence is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE . 3. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 5 of the Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligent misrepresentation is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER HERBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/2/13. (LPH)
June 6, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss/General (Written Opinion): 1. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 3, 6, and 8 of the First Amended Class Action Complaint alleging violations of the Minnesota Securities Act is DENIED. 2. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 4 of the First Amended Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligence is GRANTED. 3. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 5 of the First Amended Class Action Complaint alleging common law negligent misrepresentation is DENIED. 4. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 7 of the First Amended Class Acton Complaint alleging common law breach of contract is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 06/06/2014. (SMD)
April 30, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Directing Distribution of the Class Action Settlement Notice, Setting a Final Approval Hearing, and Preliminarily Enjoining Parallel Proceedings (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/30/15. (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Questar Capital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Scott L. Adkins
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: David A Goodwin
Represented By: Robert E. Gordon
Represented By: Bradford M. Gucciardo
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Scott D. Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Questar Capital Corporation
Represented By: Wendy J Wildung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yorktown Financial Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy J Wildung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Life Insurance Companies of North America
Represented By: Wendy J Wildung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.