Superior Edge, Inc. v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: Superior Edge, Inc.
Defendant: Monsanto Company and Site-Specific Technology Development Group, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2012cv02672
Filed: October 19, 2012
Court: Minnesota District Court
County: Blue Earth
Referring Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 86 Motion to Dismiss. 1. Motion is granted with respect to Monsanto's counterclaim for Professional Negligence (Count VII). That claim is dismissed with prejudice. 2. Motion is denied in all other respects.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on September 8, 2014. (DML)
December 16, 2014 246 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER overruling Monsanto's 163 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge; affirming 185 Order of the Magistrate Judge dated 9/11/2014 (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on December 16, 2014. (DML)
August 9, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER 1. Denying plaintiff's 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. 2. Granting as follows defendant Monsanto's 22 Motion to Dismiss. a. Plaintiff's breach of contract claim (Count II) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint incorporating the allegations of Count II into Count I. b. Plaintiff's Minnesota Uniform Deceptive Trade Practices Act claim (Count VII), and Minnesota Uniform Trade Secrets Act claim (Count IX) are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint with respect to the se claims. c. Plaintiff's fraud claim (Count III), conversion claim (Count V), and tortious interference claim (Count XI) are dismissed with prejudice. 3. Granting in part and denying in part defendant Specific Technology Development Group, Inc.'s 27 Motion to Dismiss. a. Defendant SST's motion to dismiss is granted with respect to Plaintiff's fraud claim (Count IV), conversio n claim (Count VI), and tortious interference claim (Count XII). These claims are dismissed with prejudice. b. Defendant SST's motion to dismiss is granted with respect to Plaintiff's Minnesota Uniform Decep tive Trade Practices Act claim (Count VIII). This claim is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint with respect to this claim. c. Defendant SST's motion to dismiss is denied with respect to Plaintiff's Minnesota Uniform Trade Secrets Act claim (Count X). (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on August 9, 2013. (DML)
December 6, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defendant's 71 Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Minnesota Uniform Deceptive Trade Practices Act claim (Count II) is dismissed without prejudice (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on December 6, 2013. (DML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Superior Edge, Inc. v. Monsanto Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Edge, Inc.
Represented By: William G. Osborne
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gates, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Site-Specific Technology Development Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]