Rickmyer v. Browne et al

Defendant: David Schooler, William McDonald, Ann McCandless, Jordan Area Community Council, Inc., Robert Hodson, Michael (kip) Browne, Megan Goodmundson, John Willard Hoff, John Does 1-5, John George Hubbard, II, Dave Haddy and Dan Rother
Plaintiff: Peter Rickmyer
Case Number: 0:2013cv00559
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: Minnesota District Court
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Steven E. Rau
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 189 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel [Doc. No. 3] and his Amended Motion to Appoint Counsel [Doc. No. 110] are DENIED, for reasons stated on the record on September 3, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Rau; 2. Defendant Hoff's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 19] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Hoff (Counts 1, 2, and 4) are DISMISSED with prejudice; 3. Defendant JACC's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 64] is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant JACC (Counts 1 and 2) are DISMISSED with prejudice; 4. Defendant Schooler's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 53] is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claim against Defenda nt Schooler (Count 3) is DISMISSED without prejudice; 5. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint [Doc. No. 171] is DENIED in its entirety, except as to Defendant McDonald, whose summary judgment motion remains under advisement; and 6. Defendant Schooler's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions [Doc. No. 122] is GRANTED. 7. Plaintiff's requests for an evidentiary hearing and another hearing to replace the hearing conducted by Magistrate Judge Rau are DENIED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/5/14. (LPH)
April 18, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 197 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 1. The Magistrate Judge's denial of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint [Doc. No. 171] is AFFIRMED; 2. Defendant McDonald's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 155] is GRANTED; and 3. All claims against Defendant McDonald in this case are DISMISSED with prejudice (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/18/14. (LPH)
October 1, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 215 Motion for TRO (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/01/2014. (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rickmyer v. Browne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schooler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Area Community Council, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (kip) Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Goodmundson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Willard Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John George Hubbard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Haddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Rother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Rickmyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.