DuBe et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Defendant: EverBank, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., MERSCORP, Inc. and all other persons, unknown claiming any right, title, estate, interest, or lien in the real estate described in the complaint herein
Plaintiff: Cynthia J. DuBe and Robert M. DuBe
 
Case Number: 0:2013cv00628
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
County: Dakota
Referring Judge: Tony N. Leung
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 04/02/2013. (TLU)
June 10, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 26 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff DuBes' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 37 is APPROVED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 06/10/2013. (TLU)
December 6, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 49 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 12/06/2013. (TLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DuBe et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EverBank
Represented By: Aimee D Dayhoff
Represented By: Michael A Rosow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Aimee D Dayhoff
Represented By: Michael A Rosow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Represented By: Aimee D Dayhoff
Represented By: Michael A Rosow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP, Inc.
Represented By: Aimee D Dayhoff
Represented By: Michael A Rosow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: all other persons, unknown claiming any right, title, estate, interest, or lien in the real estate described in the complaint herein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia J. DuBe
Represented By: William B Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. DuBe
Represented By: William B Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]