Vann v. Smith

Petitioner: Jerome Eugene Vann
Respondent: Michelle Smith
Case Number: 0:2013cv00893
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: Minnesota District Court
County: Washington
Referring Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 16 MOTION to Deny and Rule for the Petitioner by Default filed by Jerome Eugene Vann should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 1/14/14. (akl) (cc: Vann)
January 30, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Defendants' Motion to Deny, and Rule for Petitioner by Default [Docket No. 16] is DENIED (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/30/14. (LPH)
February 9, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [Doc. 27], OVERRULING OBJECTIONS [Doc. 28], DENYING APPLICATION FOR HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF [Doc. 1], DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, AND DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 02/09/15. (MJC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerome Eugene Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle Smith
Represented By: Jennifer R Coates
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.