Mid-Century Ins Co v. North Star Auto, et al

Plaintiff: Mid-Century Ins Co
Defendant: North Star Auto, Joseph Stark, Patricia Wade, John Roy Letourneau, Wayne Holm, Wendy Holm, Debbie Juneau, Cyrus H Juneau, Bank North, Jack Worley, Doris Klegin, Maas Motors, Kathryn Page, John Doe and Minnesota, State of
 
Case Number: 4:1989cv00245
Filed: March 27, 1989
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: MPLS Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Franklin L. Noel
Presiding Judge: James M. Rosenbaum
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer $7,500 from the Unclaimed Funds Account and disburse that amount to: Mr. Joseph Stark, 8731 32nd Circle North, New Hope, Minnesota 55427.(Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/8/12. (GRR)
September 26, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer $4,000 from the Unclaimed Funds Account and disburse that amount to: Cyrus Juneau, 470 Arnica Drive, Watertown, Minnesota 55388 23 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/26/13. (GRR)
September 27, 2013 27 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer $4,000 from the Unclaimed Funds Account and disburse that amount to: Cyrus Juneau, 470 Arnica Drive, Watertown, Minnesota 55388. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/27/13. (GRR)
December 19, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Maas Motors, Inc.'s Motion for Release of Unclaimed Funds 28 is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court shall transfer $13,500 from the Unclaimed Funds Account and disburse that amount to: Maas Motors , Inc., in care of its attorney, Lee W. Mosher, Davern McLeod & Mosher LLP, Suite 180 Valley Square Corporate Center, 7500 Olson Memorial Highway, Golden Valley, Minnesota 55427.LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/19/13. (GRR) cc: KU/Financial. Modified on 12/19/2013 (lmb).
March 26, 2014 43 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant Maas Motors, Inc.'s Motion for Release of Unclaimed Funds 37 is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court shall transfer $7,500 from the Unclaimed Funds Account and disburse that amount to: Maas Motors, Inc., in care of its attorney, Lee W. Mosher, Davern McLeod & Mosher LLP, Suite 180 Valley Square Corporate Center, 7500 Olson Memorial Highway, Golden Valley, Minnesota 55427. 2. The December 19, 2013 Judgment 34 is VACATED. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/26/14. (GRR) cc: KU/Financial Unit, TSS. Modified on 3/26/2014 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mid-Century Ins Co v. North Star Auto, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Ins Co
Represented By: Mark J Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Auto
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Roth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Wade
Represented By: Paul David Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roy Letourneau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Holm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Holm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Juneau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus H Juneau
Represented By: Cyrus H Juneau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank North
Represented By: Dennis M Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Worley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Klegin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maas Motors
Represented By: Lee W Mosher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Page
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Page
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota, State of
Represented By: Joseph M Plumer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]