Smith v. Bank of America et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Bank, Morgan Stanley ABS Capital 1 Inc., Bank of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, WMC Mortgage Corp., Recontrust Company, N.A. and Lem Adams, III
Plaintiff: Fredrick Smith
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00120
Filed: June 13, 2011
 
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Delta Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Substitute Party without prejudice. Signed by Jane M Virden on 9/9/11. (ncb)
September 22, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Jane M Virden on 9/22/11. (ncb)
August 10, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving pro se plaintiff notice of intent to treat motion as one for summary judgment. Signed by Jane M Virden on 8/10/12. (ncb)
September 20, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 44 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 9/20/2012. (lpm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. Bank of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Bank
Represented By: Sheryl Bey
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Represented By: Frederick Natale Salvo, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley ABS Capital 1 Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Natale Salvo, III
Represented By: Sheryl Bey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Represented By: Frederick Natale Salvo, III
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Represented By: Sheryl Bey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Mortgage Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Represented By: John T. Rouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lem Adams, III
Represented By: Craig Lawson Slay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]