Thomas et al v. US Bank et al

Defendant: Leader Mortgage Servicing, Thomas F. Baker IV, LLC, First Horizon and US Bank
Plaintiff: Eddie Thomas and Elizabeth Thomas
Case Number: 2:2012cv00121
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Delta Division Office
County: Panola
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Jane M Virden on 4/18/2013. (sef)
December 11, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER holding (1) Entry of judgment of dismissal of all claims against all defendants will be withheld for twenty one (21) days; and (2) The Plaintiffs will be allowed fourteen (14) days from the date hereof to respond to the Motion to Dismiss with a meritorious argument. Signed by Jane M Virden on 12/11/2013. (lec)
January 2, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by US Bank. Objections to R&R due by 1/16/2014. Signed by Jane M Virden on 01/02/2014. (lec)
January 30, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 28 , 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by US Bank. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 1/30/2014. (lpm)
April 2, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 4/2/2014. (lpm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. US Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leader Mortgage Servicing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Baker IV, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]