Turner v. State of Mississippi

Petitioner: Edwin Hart Turner
Respondent: State of Mississippi
 
Case Number: 4:2007cv00077
Filed: May 16, 2007
 
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
 
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Second Motion to Require Access to Petitioner for Purposes of Examination; granting 21 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge W. Allen Pepper, Jr. on 2/07/2008. (pbs, USDC)
February 19, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in accordance with the Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. CASE CLOSED. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 2/19/2010. (pbs, USDC)
February 19, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying habeas corpus; denying request for evidentiary hearing re 69 Final Judgment. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 2/19/2010. (pbs, USDC)
April 15, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment re 69 Final Judgment. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 4/15/2010. (pbs, USDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Turner v. State of Mississippi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Hart Turner
Represented By: James W. Craig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Marvin L. White, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]