Bass v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company

Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Matthews H. Bass
Case Number: 4:2013cv00063
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Coahoma
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072 Payment of Flood Insurance Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay for a period of 90 days.. Signed by Jane M Virden on 6/3/2013. (sef)
September 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay for a period of 60 days. Signed by Jane M Virden on 9/3/2013. (lec)
November 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Jane M Virden on 11/04/2013. (lec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Leonard DuBose Van Slyke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthews H. Bass
Represented By: William Kurt Henke
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Dilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.