Hooper et al v. Biloxi Regional Medical Center, Inc. et al

Defendant: Jennifer L. Jurich, George Loukatos, Biloxi Regional Medical Center, Inc., Amanda Pacheco and Jennifer L. Henderson
Plaintiff: Charles Hooper and Linda Hooper
Case Number: 1:2013cv00102
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: John M. Roper
Presiding Judge: Louis Guirola
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 09/03/2014 (Guirola, Louis) (Main Document 102 replaced on 9/3/2014) (JCH).
July 15, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered that the claims filed by Charles and Linda Hooper against Biloxi Regional Medical Center, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 7/15/13. (JCH)
January 30, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; granting 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. The plaintiffs' claims against Amanda Pacheco, Jennifer L. Henderson, Jennifer L. Jurich, and George Loukatos are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 1/30/14. (RLW)
February 6, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion to Dismiss; granting 77 Motion for Summary Judgment. The plaintiffs' claims against Biloxi H.M.A. are dismissed without prejudice. The plaintiffs' claims against EmCare, Inc. remain pending. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 2/6/14. (RLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper et al v. Biloxi Regional Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Jurich
Represented By: Mildred M. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Loukatos
Represented By: Mildred M. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biloxi Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Pacheco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Henderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hooper
Represented By: Ian A. Brendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hooper
Represented By: Ian A. Brendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]