Faulstick v. Southern Tire Mart, LLC

Defendant: Southern Tire Mart LLC.
Plaintiff: Albert H Faulstick
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00065
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Hattiesburg Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: granting 6 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Southern Tire Mart, LLC., Case transferred to the Southern District of Mississippi, Hattiesburg Division. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/4/13.(sek, )[Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/4/2013.]
August 11, 2014 92 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 56 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/11/2014 (scp)
August 14, 2014 93 Featured Case ORDER granting Defendant's 76 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 77 Motion in Limine; denying Defendant's 79 Motion in Limine; denying Defendant's 80 Motion in Limine; and granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 81 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on August 14, 2014 (dsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Faulstick v. Southern Tire Mart, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Tire Mart LLC.
Represented By: Jennifer Graham Hall
Represented By: J. Stephen Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert H Faulstick
Represented By: Thomas E. Loehn - PHV
Represented By: Thomas Edward Loehn
Represented By: Charles K. Chauvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]