Fairchild v. All American Check Cashing, Inc.

Defendant: All American Check Cashing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ambrea Fairchild
Case Number: 2:2013cv00092
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Hattiesburg Office
County: Forrest
Referring Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/16/2014 (scp)
August 11, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Strike, 85 Motion to Strike, 87 Motion to Strike, 94 Motion to Strike, 98 Motion to Strike and 100 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/11/2014 (scp)
August 15, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/15/2014 (scp)
December 3, 2014 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 150 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Financial Damages; and granting Defendant's 152 Motion in Limine to Exclude Discussion of Investigation. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 3, 2014 (dsl)
December 4, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's [154, 156] Motions in Limine to Exclude the testimony of Erin Petty and Alyssa Munn concerning comments made by Nathan Williams about Briana Johnson's termination. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 4, 2014 (dsl)
December 4, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's [158, 160] Motions in Limine to Exclude reference to and evidence of the lawsuits filed by Jessica Lyn Welch and Briana Fulton Johnson. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 4, 2014 (dsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairchild v. All American Check Cashing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Check Cashing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambrea Fairchild
Represented By: Daniel M. Waide
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]