Advanced Technology Building Solutions, LLC et al v. City of Jackson, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: |
Advanced Technology Building Solutions, LLC and Donald Hewitt |
Defendant: |
H.A. Beau Whittington, Jr., Jane Doe, John Doe, Brian Fenelon, Ronnie Crudup, City of Jackson, Mississippi, Harvey Johnson , Jr., Jackson Redevelopment Authority and Jason Brookins |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00389 |
Filed: |
June 6, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi |
Office: |
Jackson Office |
County: |
Hinds |
Presiding Judge: |
F. Keith Ball |
Presiding Judge: |
Daniel P. Jordan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 2, 2015 |
Filing
207
ORDER granting 189 Motion for Judgment NOV Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 01/02/2015 (Guirola, Louis)
|
September 18, 2014 |
Filing
171
ORDER denying 162 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 09/18/2014 (Guirola, Louis)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
159
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 146 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 148 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 150 Motion to Strike Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 07/31/2014 (Guirola, Louis)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
65
ORDER finding as moot 27 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons set out in the order. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on May 22, 2013. (SP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Advanced Technology Building Solutions, LLC et al v. City of Jackson, Mississippi et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: H.A. Beau Whittington, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Fred L. Banks, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Benjamin Lyle Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jane Doe |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Doe |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brian Fenelon |
Represented By: |
Fred L. Banks, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Benjamin Lyle Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ronnie Crudup |
Represented By: |
Fred L. Banks, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Benjamin Lyle Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: City of Jackson, Mississippi |
Represented By: |
Pieter Teeuwissen |
Represented By: |
Lara E. Gill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Harvey Johnson , Jr. |
Represented By: |
Pieter Teeuwissen |
Represented By: |
Lara E. Gill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jackson Redevelopment Authority |
Represented By: |
Fred L. Banks, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Benjamin Lyle Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jason Brookins |
Represented By: |
Fred L. Banks, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Benjamin Lyle Robinson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Advanced Technology Building Solutions, LLC |
Represented By: |
Louis H. Watson, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert Nicholas Norris |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Donald Hewitt |
Represented By: |
Louis H. Watson, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert Nicholas Norris |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?