U-Save Auto Rental of America, Inc. v. Sandford Miller

Defendant: Sandford Miller
Plaintiff: U-Save Auto Rental of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00127
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Linda R. Anderson
Presiding Judge: Henry T. Wingate
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 188 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 190 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 193 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 195 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot 216 Motion to Strike Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/22/2014 (Guirola, Louis)
May 22, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 137 Motion to Dismiss; denying 177 Motion to Sever Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 05/22/2014 (Guirola, Louis)
June 25, 2014 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 228 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 06/25/2014 (Guirola, Louis)
October 31, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Strike Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/31/2013 (Guirola, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U-Save Auto Rental of America, Inc. v. Sandford Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandford Miller
Represented By: O. Stephen Montagnet, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U-Save Auto Rental of America, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Gillis
Represented By: Stephen A. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.