Young v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven L Young
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv01832
Filed: November 26, 2008
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Thomas C. Mummert
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Opposition. Signed by Mag Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 5/15/09. (RJD)
June 2, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 7/1/2009. Motion to Join Parties due by 7/1/2009. Signed by Mag Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 6/2/09. (RJD)
June 2, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answers to Plaintiff's Petition. Signed by Mag Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 6/2/09. (RJD)
July 6, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension. Signed by Mag Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 7/6/09. (RJD)
September 10, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 9/10/09. (RJD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Young v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robyn D. Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]