Regions Bank v. Egyptian Concrete Company et al

Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: Egyptian Concrete Company, Glennon J Boresi and Lynn K Boresi
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv01260
Filed: August 7, 2009
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2009 30 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the receiver's motion for equitable stay of actions against the receiver and the receivership estate is DENIED. re: 28 MOTION to Stay filed by Receiver Atec, Inc., 26 MOTION to Stay Actions Against the Receiver and the Receivership Estate filed by Receiver Atec, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 11/5/2009. (MRC)
December 1, 2009 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Receivers Sale Approval Motion is granted and the sale of the Acquired Assets from the Receiver to County Materials pursuant to the Final APA is approved in all respects. [Doc. 34 ] 2. The Rec eiver is authorized to undertake any and all actions necessary and appropriate to close and otherwise consummate the transactions provided for under the Final APA. 3. County Materials acquisition of the Acquired Assets shall be free and clear of any and all Transferred Liens, which such Transferred Liens shall attach to the sale proceeds paid by County Materials to the Receiver in accordance with the Final APA. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 12/1/09. (KJF, )
September 9, 2011 74 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Regions Bank's motion for default judgment against Egyptian Concrete Company is DENIED without prejudice.[Doc 73] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Regions Bank shal l cause servce to be effected upon defendant Land Trust not later than September 29, 2011. In the absence of good cause shown, failure to timely serve said defendant shall result in the dismissal of plaintiff's claims as to that defendant without prejudice, without further notice from the Court. ( Response to Court due by 9/29/2011.). Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 9/9/2011. (MRC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Egyptian Concrete Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Michael A. Clithero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egyptian Concrete Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glennon J Boresi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn K Boresi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]