Global Crossing Local Services, Inc. v. The Missouri Public Service Commission et al

Plaintiff: Global Crossing Local Services, Inc.
Defendant: The Missouri Public Service Commission, Kevin Gunn, Robert M. Clayton, III, Jeff Davis, Terry M Jarrett, Robert S. Kenney and Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv00315
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other parties to this action may file supplemental memorandum by December 16, 2011. (Response to Court due by 12/16/2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker on 12/9/11. (TRC)
January 6, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Erik Solverud, Edward Yorkgitis, Jr., Jennifer Heintz, Mary MacDonald, and Hans Germann shall appear by telephone for a status conference on February 7, 2012. Telephone Conference set for 2/7/2012 09:00 AM in Telephone before Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker on 1/6/12. (CLA)
March 12, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that upon the filing of the Stipulation of Dismissal on March 9, 2012, the claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties, with each party to bear their own costs. The Order setting status conference on March 21, 2012 is VACATED. [Doc. 95] Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 3/12/12. (CLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Crossing Local Services, Inc. v. The Missouri Public Service Commission et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Crossing Local Services, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. Yorkgitis, Jr.
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Represented By: R. Edward Price
Represented By: Barbara A. Miller
Represented By: Anne M. Lindner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Missouri Public Service Commission
Represented By: Jennifer Heintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Gunn
Represented By: Jennifer Heintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Clayton, III
Represented By: Jennifer Heintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Davis
Represented By: Jennifer Heintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry M Jarrett
Represented By: Jennifer Heintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Kenney
Represented By: Jennifer Heintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Dennis G. Friedman
Represented By: Mary B. MacDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]