Wolff Shoe Company v. Mosinger Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Wolff Shoe Company
Defendant: Mosinger Company, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00601
Filed: April 4, 2011
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Terry I. Adelman
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 188 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Strike the Testimony of Defendants Expert, Ralph Oman, [Doc. No. 132], is granted; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony o f Defendants Damages Expert, Christina Solomon,is granted; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Exclude ExpertTestimony of Dennis Hadican, [Doc. No. 139], is denied; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mark Hoffman, [Doc. NO. 141], is denied.[Doc. No. 135] 139 135 132 141 Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 5/22/13. (CLA)
July 1, 2013 256 Featured Case OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 239 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Adverse Inference for Plaintiffs Spoliation of Detail Sheets, [Doc. No. 239], is denied. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 7/1/13. (CLA)
September 19, 2013 284 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 261 150 189 157 177 The Motions for Attorneys Fees, [Doc. No.s 150 and 171] are denied. Defendants' Alternative Cross-Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Arthur Levine,[Doc. No. 157], is denied, as moot. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, [Doc. No. 189], isdenied. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum insupport of its Motion for Reconsideration Submitting the Declaration of Christina Solomon, [Doc. No. 261], is denied. It is So Ordered.. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 9/19/13. (CEL)
March 27, 2012 65 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Wolff's Motion for Leave to file a Sur-Reply in Opposition (Docket No. 34 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mosinger's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Fai lure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mosigner's Motion to Bifurcate the Trial of Liability from Damages and Willfulness (Docket No. 30 ) is DENIED without prejudice subject to refiling, if deemed necessary, at the time the parties file pretrial compliance on September 3, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 03/27/2012; (DJO)
April 18, 2012 67 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mosinger's Motion to Compel Electronically Stored Information and Request for Expedited Ruling (Docket No. 55 ) is Granted as follows. Wolff shall produce the requested financial spreadsheets in E xcel format no later than April 24, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mosinger's Request for Hearing on Motion to Compel Electronically Stored Information (Docket No. 66 ) is Denied. The undersigned urges the parties to work together in resolving future discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 04/18/2012; (DJO)
July 16, 2012 90 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Wolff Shoe Company's ("Wolff") Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Adding Additional Party Defendant (Docket No. 76) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the p arties shall submit a joint proposed amended scheduling plan no later than July 31, 2012. A Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 is set for August 2, 2012, at 3:00 p.m. by telephone with the undersigned. Counsel will be expected to dis cuss in detail all matters covered by Fed.R.Civ.P. 16, as well as matters set forth in their joint proposed amended scheduling plan, and a firm and realistic trial setting will be established at or shortly after the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 7/16/12. (KXS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wolff Shoe Company v. Mosinger Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolff Shoe Company
Represented By: Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosinger Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]