Markel American Insurance Company v.Cool, et al

Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Defendant: James Cool, Joann Cool and Keycorp
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00717
Filed: April 21, 2011
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2011 29 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SELL OR TRANSFER EVIDENCE 26 Based on the above analysis, the Court finds that KeyCorps motion for leave to sell or transfer evidence should be DENIED. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for leave to sell or transfer yacht filed by Defendant KeyCorp, doing business as Key Bank, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker on 11/3/11. (CLA)
December 12, 2011 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that effective December 12, 2011, Defendant KeyCorp, d/b/a Key Bank, is allowed to market, sell, or otherwise transfer the yacht and will not be sanctioned or otherwise held liable for spoliation of evidence for marketing, selling, or otherwise transferring the yacht. [Doc. 30 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A Baker on 12/12/11. (TRC)
February 10, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that upon the stipulation of the parties filed on February 8, 2012, the claims and counterclaims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice as to all parties, with each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 2/10/12. (CLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v.Cool, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtney Stirrat
Represented By: James K. Mondl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cool
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Cool
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keycorp
Represented By: Matthew S. Layfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]