Kozeny & McCubbin, LC v. The Estate Of Deborah L. Hall et al

Defendant: All of the unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, assigns, donees, alienees, legatees, administrators, executors, guardians, mortgagees, trustees, and legal representatives and all other persons, corporat, The Estate Of Deborah L. Hall, The Unknown Heirs Of Deborah L. Hall, Asset Acceptance LLC, United States of America, State Of Missouri and All other persons and entities, unknown, claiming any right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the real property described in this Petition, adverse to plaintiffs ownership, or any cloud on plaintif
Plaintiff: Kozeny & McCubbin, LC
Case Number: 4:2011cv00970
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall obtain service on defendant the Unknown Heirs of Deborah Hall Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 2/14/12. (LAH)
February 21, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Clerk of the Court shall docket the letter received from Shannon Hall on February 17, 2012 and shall serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order and a copy of the docket sheet upon Shannon Hall, 1120 Ash Street, Atchison, KS 66002. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 2/21/12. (cc: Copy of Memorandum and Order, Docket Sheet forwarded to Shannon Hall at listed address.)(ARL)
February 29, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for service by publication 28 is granted, except that plaintiff shall also personally serve alleged heir Shannon Hall at the address provided by her to the Court on February 17, 2012, which appears in the Order dated February 21, 2012.. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 2/29/12. (LGK)
April 9, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff shall move for entry of default against defendant unknown heirs of Deborah Hall, accompanied by all necessary affidavits and exhibits. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 4/9/2012. (RAK)
May 15, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to deposit funds and for attorneys' fees and costs [#37] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 67(a), deposit the funds, less $1,314 .00 for attorneys' fees and costs, with the Clerk of the Court. Once plaintiff has deposited the funds with the Court, it shall be discharged from all further liability and dismissed from this suit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants United States of America and Shannon Hall shall file a joint memorandum with the Court by no later than June 1, 2012, advising the Court whether this action has been fully resolved or whether a scheduling conference is required. If the case is resolved, the joint memorandum shall be accompanied by any proposed Orders, motions, or exhibits necessary for this case to be finally concluded. Counsel for the United States of America shall act as lead counsel and be responsible for ensuring compliance with this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to deposit funds [#17] is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 5/15/12. (LAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozeny & McCubbin, LC v. The Estate Of Deborah L. Hall et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All of the unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, assigns, donees, alienees, legatees, administrators, executors, guardians, mortgagees, trustees, and legal representatives and all other persons, corporat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate Of Deborah L. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs Of Deborah L. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Acceptance LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Richard G. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Missouri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All other persons and entities, unknown, claiming any right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the real property described in this Petition, adverse to plaintiffs ownership, or any cloud on plaintif
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kozeny & McCubbin, LC
Represented By: Kerry C. Feld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]