Mallicoat v. Archer Daniels-Midland Company et al

Plaintiff: Roger Mallicoat
Defendant: Archer Daniels-Midland Company and American River Transportation Co.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01218
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: Terry I. Adelman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Daubert Motion to Exclude Leroy Grossman (ECF No. 27 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 11/12/13. (KJS)
March 24, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Passavant Area Hospitals Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 44) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 3/24/2014. (KMS)
April 2, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Adjudicate Liens (ECF No. 41 ) is DENIED. Consistent with this Memorandum and Order, the parties shall file a joint status report with this Court no later than April 11, 2014. ( Status Report due by 4/11/2014.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 4/2/14. (KKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallicoat v. Archer Daniels-Midland Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Mallicoat
Represented By: Leonard P. Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Daniels-Midland Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American River Transportation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.