Dejana et al v. Marine Technology, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Linda Dejana and William T. Graff
Defendant: Marine Technology, Inc. and Randy M. Scism
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv01690
Filed: September 28, 2011
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
 
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Rule 60 Motion for Reconsideration 113 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Linda Dejana produce her Federal and state tax returns for the years 2009 to 2011 and a copy of any contract between Atrium Management Services, Inc. and Philip Dejana, subject to a protective order agreed to by the parties. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/9/2012. (RAK)
March 26, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaim 80 , 81 are DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/26/2013. (RAK)
July 10, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Oral Argument regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Sur-Rebuttal Expert Reports 142 is GRANTED. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Proposed "Sur-Rebuttal" Expert Reports of Brant Savander and Anthony Caiazzo [ECF No. 138] on Friday, July 19, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/10/13. (LAH)
July 12, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Continue Oral Argument Hearing 144 is GRANTED. This matter previously scheduled for oral argument on July 19, 2013 on Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Proposed Sur-Rebuttal Expert Reports of Brant Savander and Anthony Caiazzo [ECF No. 138] is reset for Friday, July 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/12/2013. (RAK)
December 20, 2013 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Randy M. Scisms Motion for Summary Judgment 148 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Marine Technology, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment 154 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment 166 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Proposed Sur-Rebuttal Expert Reports of Brant Savander and Anthony Caiazzo 138 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Parts of Thomas Irelands Expert Testimony 146 is GRANTED consistent with the Courts Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Anthony Caiazzo 155 , Christopher Long 165 , and Brant Savander 168 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of Eric Greene 158 , Anand Shah, P.E. 159 , Scott Graham, P.E. 160 , Lane Hudgins 161 , and Donald Barceloux, M.D. 162 are DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/20/13. (ARL)
September 26, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER terminating 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that it does not have personal jurisdiction over Defendants. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Docket En try 17 and to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Case transferred to District of Missouri. SO ORDERED by JUDGE JOANNA SEYBERT on 9/26/11. C/ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Valle, Christine)
January 11, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER {filed in related case no. 4:11CV1457 FRB} -.....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice(Doc. #10) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this cause is hereby dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Consolidate(Doc. #7) and Amended Motion to Consolidate (Doc. #8) are denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Defendants' Motion to Consolidate (Doc. #9) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall cause a copy of this Memorandum and Order to be filed and docketed in Dejana, et al. v. Marine Tech.,Inc., et al., Cause No. 4:11CV1690 JAR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 1/11/2012. (MRC) .
May 9, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Protective Order ECF No. 55 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable John A. Ross on 5/9/2012. (RAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dejana et al v. Marine Technology, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Dejana
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Represented By: Robert S. Moran, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Represented By: Michael Allweiss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Graff
Represented By: Michael Allweiss
Represented By: Justin Timothy Green
Represented By: Robert S. Moran, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel O. Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Keith D. Heinold
Represented By: Daniel Gerard McDermott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy M. Scism
Represented By: Keith D. Heinold
Represented By: Daniel Gerard McDermott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]