Grant v. Convergys Corporation

Plaintiff: Hope Grant
Defendant: Convergys Corporation
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00496
Filed: March 16, 2012
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants request for reconsideration [Doc. #99] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants alternative request for certification for interlocutory appeal [Doc. #99] is granted. IT IS HEREBY OR DERED that the Memorandum and Order entered on March 1, 2013 [Doc. # 97] is amended to certify the following question for immediate appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b): Is the provision in defendants employment application containing plaintiffs wa iver of the right to bring or participate in class or collective litigation or claims against defendant unenforceable as a violation of substantive rights protected by the National Labor Relations Act, 29 U.S.C. § 151 et seq.? IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that all proceedings in this case are stayed pending resolution of the defendants application to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit for an interlocutory appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion for an extension of time to file a reply is moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/3/2013. (KMS)
May 8, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to toll the statute of limitations [Doc. #108] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/8/2013. (KMS)
March 1, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's class and collective allegations [Doc. # 36 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 03/01/2013. (DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grant v. Convergys Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Grant
Represented By: Russell C. Riggan
Represented By: Mark A. Potashnick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergys Corporation
Represented By: Eugene J. Droder, III
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: George E. Yund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]