West Coast Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-27

Plaintiff: West Coast Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-27
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv01874
Filed: October 15, 2012
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant John Doe No. 1's Motion for Ad Litem Counsel for Defendants 9 is DENIED in part without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than November 19, 2012, Plaintiff West Coast Productions, Inc., shall file a response to Defendants motion to sever. Dated this. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/8/2012. (RAK)
November 15, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's Memorandum and Order of November 8, 2012 10 is modified and the motion for appointment of counsel and motion to sever 9 filed by a certain non-party Doe is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike a Certain Non-Party Doe's Motion for Ad Litem Counsel For Defendants 11 is DENIED and the filing shall remain a part of the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any further pleadings filed in this matter on behalf of a non-party will be considered by the Court only after a proper motion to intervene has been filed pursuant to Rule 24, Fed.R.Civ.P. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/15/12. (LAH)
February 20, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Doe 13's pro se motion 14 shall be sealed from public viewing.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/20/13. (LGK)
March 11, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Doe 13's pro se motion 14 , while sealed from public viewing, shall be made available to the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file its response to Defendant Doe 13's pro se motion to quash no later than March 18, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for a hearing on Doe 13's motion is DENIED at this time. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/11/2013. (RAK)
March 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Specific Doe Defendant 19 is GRANTED and the Doe Defendant specifically identified as Doe Number 27, IP Address 71.86.157.120, ISP Legal Name Charter Communications, Inc., is DISMISSED without prejudice. Following this dismissal, 26 Doe Defendants remain in this action. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/18/2013. (RAK)
June 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Doe 13's pro se Motion to Quash 14 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Does 2, Does 5-20, 22-25 are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/25/13. (LAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: West Coast Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-27
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-27
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]