Missouri Insurance Coalition v. Huff

Plaintiff: Missouri Insurance Coalition, Health Alliance Life Insurance Company and HMO Missouri , Inc.
Defendant: John M. Huff
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv02354
Filed: December 19, 2012
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to dismiss the case for improper venue, or to transfer venue, is DENIED. (Doc. No. 22.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/30/2013. (NCL)
January 31, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion of Our Lady's Inn to intervene in this action is DENIED. (Doc. No. 33.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/31/2013. (NCL)
March 14, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY DECLARED that subsections 4, 5, and 6(1), (2) and (3) of Missouri Revised Statutes § 376.1199 are invalid. The Court assumes that Defendants commitment not to enforce any provisions found unconstitutional requires the State of Missouri to withdraw any administrative complaints filed against health insurers for violations of the provisions of the state law at issue. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/14/2013. (KSM)
May 22, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY DECLARED that subsections 1(4), 4, 5, and 6(1), 6(2), and 6(3) of Missouri Revised Statutes § 376.1199 are invalid. The Court assumes that Defendants commitment not to enforce any provisions found uncon stitutional requires the State of Missouri to withdraw any administrative complaints filed against health insurers for violations of the provisions of the state law at issue. A separate Judgment shall accompany this memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/22/2013. (KSH)
June 28, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the post-judgment motion of Our Lady's Inn to intervene is DENIED. (Doc. No. 71.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/28/13. (KXS)
June 28, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the post-judgment motion of the Bick Group to intervene in this case is DENIED. (Doc. No. 80.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/28/13. (KXS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Missouri Insurance Coalition v. Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Insurance Coalition
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Represented By: David W. Gearhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Alliance Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David W. Gearhart
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO Missouri , Inc.
Represented By: David W. Gearhart
Represented By: Neal F. Perryman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Huff
Represented By: Jeremiah J. Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]