Fry v. Accent Marketing Services L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Roy Fry
Defendant: Accent Marketing Services L.L.C.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00059
Filed: January 11, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file an amended joint proposed scheduling plan by Friday, April 12, 2013 at 5:00 p.m. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/12/2013.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on April 11, 2013. (MCB)
May 31, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings [# 24 ] is granted only to the limited extent set out above, and in all other respects is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on May 31, 2013. (BRP)
August 13, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 36 MOTION to Certify Class Collectively filed by Plaintiff Roy Fry. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for order conditionally certifying collective action [#36] is granted, and the C ourt conditionally certifies a class of all current and former non-exempt employees of defendant Accent Marketing Services L.L.C. at its Farmington, Missouri call center who were required to perform tasks such as booting up and shutting down their computers and logging in and out of various programs without pay during their unpaid meal periods and before and after their scheduled shifts, for a period of three (3) years from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall pr ovide plaintiff's attorneys with the names, employment dates, and last known addresses of all potential class members within 14 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed form of notice fo r the Courts consideration, consistent with this Order, within 20 days of the date of this Order. If the parties cannot agree on a joint proposed form of notice after good faith efforts, then the parties shall file their own proposed forms of notice, each with a brief memorandum setting out the areas of disagreement and support for their position, for the Courts consideration. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on August 13, 2013. (MCB)
January 27, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER APPROVING re: 56 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval filed by Plaintiff Roy Fry, Defendant Accent Marketing Services L.L.C.. Motion is granted, and the parties shall effectuate the terms of the settlement agreemen t. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 45 days after the end of the opt-in period, the parties shall file a joint status report which sets out the status of the settlement and informs me whether all parties have complied with all provisions of the s ettlement agreement. If so, then the parties shall also file a joint motion for stipulation of dismissal and entry of final judgment, which shall include a proposed order of final judgment as an attachment to the motion. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on January 27, 2014. (MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fry v. Accent Marketing Services L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Fry
Represented By: Charles J. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accent Marketing Services L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]