Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. IPSI 12559 v. SSDD,LLC.

Defendant: SSDD, LLC
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. IPSI 12559
Case Number: 4:2013cv00193
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on rescission, Condition A and Exclusion 2(m) is DENIED. [Doc. 94] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant SSDD, LLCs motion for summary judgment is DENIED. [Doc . 91] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on SSDD's claims under §§ 375.296 and 375.420, Mo. Rev. Stat., is DENIED. [Doc. 96] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to strike certain portions o f SSDD's "Statement of Additional Facts" is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 112] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant SSDD, LLC's motions to strike the declarations of Kerri Senger, Andrew R. Fowles and Laura Stevens are DENIED as moot. [Do cs. 104, 114] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SSDD's motion for jury trial is GRANTED pursuant to Rule 39(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., and plaintiffs' motion to strike SSDD, LLCs request for jury trial is DENIED. [Doc. 72] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Order (Doc. 28) is modified to the extent that the case is set for jury trial on Monday, July 21, 2014, at 9:00 a.m., pretrial compliance materials are due July 1, 2014, and the final pretrial conference is set for Thursday, July 17, 2014, at 2:00 p.m.tio (Jury Trial set for 7/21/2014 09:00 AM before District Judge Charles A. Shaw., Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2014 02:00 PM before District Judge Charles A. Shaw., Pretrial Compliance due by 7/1/2014.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/22/2014. (NCL)
July 7, 2014 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion in limine to exclude the testimony of defendants expert witness Mr. Donald J. Brayer is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth herein. [Doc. 86] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/7/14. (JWJ)
July 10, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 132 MOTION for Sanctions and/or Motion in Limine filed by SSDD, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that SSDD, LLC's Motion for Sanctions and/or Motion in Limine Pursuant to Rule 37 to Exclude the Testimony of Mr. Andrew Fowles and Mr. Tony Milo at Trial is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on July 10, 2014. (MCB)
May 31, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant SSDD, LLC's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is DENIED. [Doc. 14] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/31/2013. (NCL)
December 23, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Underwriters' Motion to Strike Certain Allegations of SSDD's Answer is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; the motion is GRANTED as to paragraphs 3, 18, 20, 24 and 28 of SSDD's Answ er and those paragraphs are hereby stricken, and the motion is DENIED in all other respects. [Doc. 31] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant SSDD shall replead paragraphs 3, 18, 20, 24 and 28 of its Answer, and any other paragraphs of its Answe r as currently pleaded that fail to comply with the requirements of Rule 8(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. As to each allegation of the Amended Complaint, SSDD must either admit, deny, or state in good faith that it lacks sufficient information and knowledge to form a belief as to the truth of the allegation. SSDD shall avoid the use of colloquialisms and surplusage such as that a document "speaks for itself" and demanding "strict proof," and SSDD shall not refuse to answer any allegati ons on the basis that they contain legal conclusions, as Rule 8(b) provides no basis for such responses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant SSDD's Amended Answer shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Memorandum an d Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Underwriters' Motion to Strike SSDD's Affirmative Defenses is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; the motion is GRANTED as to Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1, 5 and 16, and DENIED in all other respects. [Doc. 31] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss SSDDs Counterclaims is DENIED. [Doc. 31] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 12/23/2013. (NCL)
January 22, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant SSDD, LLCs motion to quash plaintiffs notice of deposition to Mr. Don Brayer or, in the alternative, for a protective order is DENIED in all respects. Doc. 53 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pl aintiffs Underwriters motion to modify the Case Management Order is GRANTED, to the extent that plaintiffs may take the deposition of SSDDs expert witness Mr. Don Brayer by February 14, 2014. Doc. 57 . Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/22/2014. (RAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. IPSI 12559 v. SSDD,LLC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSDD, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. IPSI 12559
Represented By: Robyn G. Fox
Represented By: Seth G. Gausnell
Represented By: Patricia M. B. Caracci
Represented By: Neal R. Novak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]