Downing et al v. Riceland Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: Don M. Downing and Adam J. Levitt
Defendant: Riceland Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00321
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: David D. Noce
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:(5344 in 4:06-md-01811-CDP, 70 in 4:13-cv-00321-CDP) (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for class certification [# 70 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Class Plaintiffs Gray, Ritter & Graham, P.C., Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLC, and Looper Reed & McGraw, P.C., are appointed as class representatives to represent the following class: All persons and entities that provided or paid for common benefit services, materials , and/or related expense items (except Defendant). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Patrick J. Stueve, Todd E. Hilton and Bradley T. Wilders, of Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, 460 Nichols Rd. Suite 200, Kansas City, MO 64112, are appointed as Class Counsel. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 03/19/2015. (CBL)
March 31, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended class action complaint [# 27 ; # 5219 ] is granted, and the proposed amended complaint is deemed filed today. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction [# 38 ; # 5237 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 03/31/2014. (CBL)
August 20, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss Riceland's counterclaim [# 58 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Riceland's original counterclaim [# 22 ] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 08/20/2014. (CBL)
November 7, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [# 86] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for order under Rule 54(b) entering final judgment on Riceland's c ounterclaims [# 74] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that JUDGMENT BE ENTERED with respect to the issues determined in this court's Memorandum and Order dated August 20, 2014 [Doc. 72] and I will today enter a final judgment in favor of plainti ffs dismissing with prejudice the claims asserted by Riceland in its Counterclaim. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to expedite ruling on the pending motion for an order under Rule 54(b) entering final judgment on Riceland's counterclaims [# 85] is denied as moot, and its motions to supplement [## 92 & 93] are granted. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on November 7, 2014. (MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing et al v. Riceland Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riceland Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly M. Bousquet
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: John R. Musgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]