Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-188

Defendant: Does 1-188
Plaintiff: Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00388
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that those Defendants Doe #2 through Doe #188 who are still in the action are SEVERED from this action and the claims against them are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/28/13. (JWJ)
March 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to take discovery prior to the Rule 26(f) conference is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 2.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may immediately serve Rule 45 subpoenas on t he ISPs listed in Exhibit A to the Complaint to obtain information to identify Does 1-188, specifically his or her name, address, MAC address, and email address. The subpoenas shall have a copy of this Memorandum and Order attached. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to serve the ISPs.... SEE ORDER FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/8/2013. (KSM)
May 1, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the discovery schedule herein is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 6.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may immediately serve Rule 45 subpoenas on the ISPs l isted in Exhibit A to the Complaint to obtain information to identify Does 1-188, specifically his or her name, address, MAC address, and email address. The subpoenas shall have a copy of this Memorandum and Order attached. Plaintiff shall have 30 da ys from the date of this Memorandum and Order to serve the ISPs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the ISPs will have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena upon them to serve the relevant Does with a copy of the subpoena and a copy of this Memorandum and Order. The ISPs may serve the Does using any reasonable means, including written notice sent to their last known address, transmitted either by first-class mail or via overnight service......SEE ORDER FOR COMEPLETE DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/1/2013. (NCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC v. Does 1-188
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-188
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC
Represented By: Joan M. Swartz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]