French v. Wallace

Petitioner: Gerrek French
Respondent: Ian Wallace
Case Number: 4:2013cv00472
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause 22 is GRANTED. Petitioner is granted until Friday, October 25, 2013 in which to file his reply to Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to file anAmended Petition 23 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/17/13. (LAH)
March 18, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to petitioner a copy of his petition for writ of habeas corpus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner must sign and return the petition to the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/18/2013. (RAK)
April 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motions for appointment of counsel [Doc. #3 and #6] are DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for evidentiary hearing [Doc. #4] is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/4/13. (LAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerrek French
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ian Wallace
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]