Ford v. Delta Airlines

Plaintiff: Douglas Lamar Ford
Defendant: Delta Airlines
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01058
Filed: June 4, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 11 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Delta Airlines' motion for partial dismissal is GRANTED. [Doc. 7] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claim of race discrimination in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, 42 U.S.C. § 2000e, is DISMISSED. An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/15/2013. (NCL)
January 16, 2014 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [Doc. 18] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 20] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will stay the issuance of an Order Referring the Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution until after it has had the opportunity to resolve defendant's pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings on or before January 24, 2014. If plaintiff fails to file a timely response, the Court will consider defendants motion without the benefit of plaintiff's response. (Response to Court due by 1/24/2014.) Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/16/2014. (NCL)
February 28, 2014 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively CLOSE this action, subject to reopening on a motion filed in compliance with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED without prejudice to being reinstated, on motion of the defendant, in the event the case is reopened. [Doc. 16] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/28/2014. (NCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ford v. Delta Airlines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Lamar Ford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines
Represented By: Rodney A. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]