Hicks v. Clay County, Missouri et al

Plaintiff: Michael W. Hicks
Defendant: Clay County, Missouri, Paul Vescovo, III, Susie James and Paul Chessin
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv00362
Filed: May 13, 2008
 
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Sarah W. Hays
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 115 Featured Case ORDER - Motions terminated: denying 95 plaintiff's MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Joint proposed scheduling and trial order due on or before 8/12/2010. Signed on 7/27/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
December 6, 2010 140 Featured Case ORDER granting 126 defendant Chessin's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and denying as moot 136 motion for protective order. Signed on 12/06/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
October 30, 2008 35 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant Chessin's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue 15 is GRANTED IN PART as it relates to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims and DENIED IN PART as to a ll other aspects; Defendant Chessin's Suggestion in Support of his Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief can be Granted 20 is GRANTED IN PART as it relates to claims against defendant Chessin in his official capacity and DENIED IN PART as to all other aspects; Defendant Chessin's Suggestion in Support of his Motion to Stay Discovery 21 is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Suggestions in Opposition to Defendant Chessin's M otion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, with Suggestions in Support 27 is GRANTED, and the Court treats the information contained in Doc. No. 27 as properly-filed supplemental suggestions in opposition to the motion to dismiss; and Defendant Paul Chessin's Motion for 14 Day Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of his Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to the Stay 31 is GRANTED and the Court treats Defendant Chessin's reply suggestions (Doc. No. 33) as timely-filed. Signed by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. on 10/30/08. (Enss, Rhonda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hicks v. Clay County, Missouri et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Hicks
Represented By: Leland M. Shurin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay County, Missouri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Vescovo, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie James
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Chessin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]