Mayo et al v. GMAC Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: Michael D Mayo and Sharron Mayo
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv00568
Filed: August 7, 2008
 
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Truth in Lending Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2011 240 Featured Case ORDER denying 208 defendants' motion to strike. Signed on 1/13/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
January 13, 2011 242 Featured Case ORDER denying 211 Plaintiffs' motion to strike. Signed on 1/13/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
January 13, 2011 243 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 173 174 177 defendants' motions for summary judgment. All claims against Defendants GMAC Mortgage, LLC and Residential Funding Company, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 1/13/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
February 9, 2011 248 Featured Case ORDER denying 244 plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. Signed on 2/9/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
March 25, 2011 250 Featured Case ORDER re 169 motion to certify class. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit additional briefing on two issues: (1) an amended proposed class definition; and (2) whether an appropriately defined class would be sufficiently numerous to make joinder of all members impracticable. Signed on 3/25/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
July 1, 2011 256 Featured Case ORDER denying 169 Plaintiff Michael Mayo's motion to certify class. Signed on 7/1/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
July 26, 2011 263 Featured Case ORDER denying 259 Plaintiff's motion to stay. Signed on 7/26/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
August 10, 2011 271 Featured Case ORDER denying 269 motion to stay briefing schedule. Signed on 8/10/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
December 16, 2011 285 Featured Case ORDER granting 278 defendants' motion for order to show cause. An injunction is entered against Mayo and his attorneys. Plaintiff Mayo and his wife, and anyone acting on his behalf, are enjoined for 30 days from any activity or participation i n the Shokere lawsuit which might adjudicate or settle their claim, or from filing any similar lawsuit against GMACM and RFC in any other court, without the prior written approval of this Court. Defendants UBS and Deutsche Bank collectively shall post a surety bond in the amount of $5,000 within seven days. In the alternative to posting a surety bond, they may deposit in the Court registry $5,000. Signed on 12/16/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
January 13, 2012 291 Featured Case ORDER reversing the Court's previously entered partially summary judgment order. The award of summary judgment in favor RFC and GMACM on all claims is reversed. The injunction entered December 16, 2011, is extended until further order of this Court. Plaintiff shall file a revised motion for class certification and brief in support on or before February 13, 2012. Signed on 1/13/12 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
September 21, 2012 322 Featured Case ORDER denying 296 motion to certify class. Signed on September 21, 2012 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mayo et al v. GMAC Mortgage LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Mayo
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Mayo
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Randolph G. Willis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]