C. v. Dirty World, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendant Dirty World, LLC and Nik Richie published a photograph of her along with defamatory statements provided by a third party that contain private, embarrassing and false information about her relationship with another person.

Plaintiff: S. C.
Defendant: Dirty World, LLC and Nik Richie
Case Number: 4:2011cv00392
Filed: April 14, 2011
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Dean Whipple
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 57 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 12, 2012 56 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 45) is GRANTED. Signed on 03/12/2012 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
February 23, 2012 55 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 45 MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Sharp, Darren)
February 23, 2012 54 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Their Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limits (Doc. 53 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 02/23/2012 by District Judge Dean Whipple. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Willis, Kathy)
February 22, 2012 53 MOTION for leave to file excess pages Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Their Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limits filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/12/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sharp, Darren)
February 8, 2012 52 SUGGESTIONS in opposition to motion for summary judgment re 45 MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C.. Reply suggestions due by 2/27/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cited to portions of Deposition of Nik Richie, # 2 Exhibit Posts in "Would You?" category addressed to Nik Richie, # 3 Exhibit Cited to portion of Request For Admission of Nik Richie)(Related document(s) 45 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
January 17, 2012 51 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond (Doc. 49 ) and First Amended Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond (Doc. 50 ) are GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall file her response to Defendants' summary judgment motion by February 9, 2012. Signed on 01/17/2012 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
January 13, 2012 50 Amended MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 45 MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of S. C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/30/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 45 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
January 11, 2012 49 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 45 MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of S. C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/30/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 45 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
December 23, 2011 48 First NOTICE to take deposition of Nik Lamas-Richie filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
December 23, 2011 47 First NOTICE to take deposition of Dirty World, LLC filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
December 23, 2011 46 SUGGESTIONS in support re 45 MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nik-Lamas Richie)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Sharp, Darren)
December 23, 2011 45 MOTION for summary judgment Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/17/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court (Sharp, Darren)
December 22, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Their Brief in Excess of Page Limit (Doc. 43) is GRANTED. Signed on 12/22/2011 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
December 21, 2011 43 MOTION for leave to file excess pages Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Their Brief in Excess of Page Limit filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/9/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sharp, Darren)
November 17, 2011 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie.(Sharp, Darren)
November 15, 2011 41 NOTICE of change of address by Darren K. Sharp (Sharp, Darren)
October 19, 2011 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. C. Request for Admissions to Defendant Dirty World, LLC filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
October 19, 2011 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. C. Request for Admissions to Defendant Richie filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
October 19, 2011 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. C. Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Dirty World, LLC filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
October 19, 2011 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. C. Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Richie filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
October 19, 2011 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. C. Interrogatories to Defendant Dirty World, LLC filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
October 19, 2011 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. C. Interrogatories to Defendant Richie filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
September 22, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. 29) is GRANTED. Counts V and VI and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed on 09/22/2011 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
September 9, 2011 33 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Gingras on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Gingras, David)
August 26, 2011 32 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C.. Reply suggestions due by 9/12/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 29 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
August 9, 2011 31 Defendants' ANSWER to 28 Amended Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on behalf of Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie.(Sharp, Darren)
August 9, 2011 30 SUGGESTIONS in support re 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Sharp, Darren)
August 9, 2011 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sharp, Darren)
July 29, 2011 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
July 29, 2011 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C..(O'Connor, Matthew)
July 27, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Rule 56(f) Motion to Deny or Delay Ruling on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 17) is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 13) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; it is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint (Doc. 21) is GRANTED. Signed on 07/27/2011 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
July 26, 2011 25 Featured Case SCHEDULING and TRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8B, Kansas City, before District Judge Dean Whipple. Signed on 07/26/2011 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Attachments: # 1 pretrial memo template) (Willis, Kathy)
July 19, 2011 24 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Jointly by the Parties by S. C.. (O'Connor, Matthew)
July 8, 2011 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (O'Connor, Matthew)
July 8, 2011 22 SUGGESTIONS in support re 21 First MOTION to amend/correct 1 Complaint filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 21 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
July 8, 2011 21 First MOTION to amend/correct 1 Complaint filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of S. C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/25/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Related document(s) 1 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
July 8, 2011 20 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 17 MOTION for order Deny or Delay Ruling on Summary Judgment Motion Pursuant to FRCP 56(f), or in the Alternative Enlargment of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
June 20, 2011 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 17 MOTION for order Deny or Delay Ruling on Summary Judgment Motion Pursuant to FRCP 56(f), or in the Alternative Enlargment of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion filed by David Gingras on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. Reply suggestions due by 7/8/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David S. Gingras In Support of Defendants' Suggestions in Opposition)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Gingras, David)
June 17, 2011 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re 17 MOTION for order Deny or Delay Ruling on Summary Judgment Motion Pursuant to FRCP 56(f), or in the Alternative Enlargment of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C.. (Related document(s) 17 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
June 17, 2011 17 MOTION for order Deny or Delay Ruling on Summary Judgment Motion Pursuant to FRCP 56(f), or in the Alternative Enlargment of Time to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of S. C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/5/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(O'Connor, Matthew)
June 1, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Case (Doc. 3) is DENIED. Signed on 06/01/2011 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
May 27, 2011 15 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 3 MOTION to seal case filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 3 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
May 24, 2011 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re 13 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Nik-Lamas Richie in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Sharp, Darren)
May 24, 2011 13 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/17/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Sharp, Darren)
May 19, 2011 12 Rule 16 Notice. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/19/2011. Signed on 05/19/2011 by District Judge Dean Whipple. (Willis, Kathy)
May 18, 2011 RECEIPT number KCMO013099 in the amount of $50 Pro Hac Vice fee issued to Armstrong Teasdale for David Gingras. (Martin, Jan)
May 17, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney David Gingras for Dirty World, LLC,David Gingras for Nik Richie allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Signed on 05/17/11 by District Judge Dean Whipple. ECF Attorney Registration form emailed to counsel for completion. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(McDowell, Shelly)
May 17, 2011 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 3 MOTION to seal case filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. Reply suggestions due by 6/3/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 3 ) (Sharp, Darren)
May 17, 2011 9 Motion to allow David Gingras to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number Check) filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. (Sharp, Darren)
May 17, 2011 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Darren K. Sharp on behalf of Defendants Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie.(Sharp, Darren)
May 17, 2011 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on behalf of Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie.(Sharp, Darren)
April 26, 2011 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by S. C.. (O'Connor, Matthew)
April 26, 2011 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Nik Richie. (Martin, Jan)
April 25, 2011 5 NOTICE of filing Notice of Submission of Proposed Order to Seal Case by S. C. re 3 MOTION to seal case (O'Connor, Matthew)
April 25, 2011 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re 3 MOTION to seal case filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of Plaintiff S. C.. (Related document(s) 3 ) (O'Connor, Matthew)
April 25, 2011 3 MOTION to seal case filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of S. C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/12/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (O'Connor, Matthew)
April 20, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dirty World, LLC, Nik Richie. (Martin, Jan)
April 20, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dirty World, LLC, and Nik Richie. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
April 15, 2011 2 Notice of EAP assignment to Program Administrator sent via electronic notice to plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order)(Martin, Jan)
April 14, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew J. O'Connor on behalf of S. C.. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-2691185. Service due by 8/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Connor, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. Dirty World, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Bradly H. Bergman
Represented By: Matthew J. O'Connor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirty World, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nik Richie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]