Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00356
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Andrew
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 30 Order of Dismissal entered by Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea)
September 13, 2013 29 Joint MOTION to dismiss case filed by Paul A. Lesko on behalf of Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/30/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lesko, Paul)
August 2, 2013 28 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 8/2/2013 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Hopkins, Karen)
August 1, 2013 27 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/20/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. Jury Trial set for 4/20/2015 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (ODS) before District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2014. A claim construction hearing will be held, if necessary, at 9:00 a.m. 4/18/2014. Signed on 8/1/2013 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Hopkins, Karen)
July 30, 2013 26 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC. (Lesko, Paul)
July 23, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 motion for extension of time. Parties' joint proposed scheduling order and discovery plan should be filed on or before July 30, 2013. Signed on 7-23-13 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Hoberock, Meredith)
July 23, 2013 24 Joint MOTION for extension of time to file proposed scheduling order and discovery plan filed by Jay Heidrick on behalf of Google, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/9/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Heidrick, Jay)
June 20, 2013 23 ANSWER to 21 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC on behalf of Google, Inc..(Jones, Russell)
June 10, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER entered by Judge Ortrie Smith denying 17 motion to reassign/transfer case. (Matthes, Renea)
June 7, 2013 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Dameron, Matthew)
June 7, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 19 motions to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Dara M Kurlancheek and Brian A Rosenthal for Google, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. Copy of Order and CM/ECF Registration forms mailed to Dara M Kurlancheek and Brian A Rosenthal This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorneys. (Martin, Jan)
June 6, 2013 19 Motion to allow Brian Rosenthal to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3551378) filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Jones, Russell)
June 6, 2013 18 Motion to allow Dara Kurlancheek to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3551357) filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Jones, Russell)
June 6, 2013 17 MOTION to reassign/transfer case (Unopposed) filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/24/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dameron, Matthew)
June 3, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google, Inc. answer due 6/10/2013. Signed on 6/3/13 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Wolfe, Steve)
June 3, 2013 15 Second MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/20/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Jones, Russell)
May 31, 2013 14 NOTICE of appearance by Jay Heidrick on behalf of Google, Inc. (Heidrick, Jay)
May 28, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 and 12 motions to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Edward D Johnson and Stephen E Baskin for Google, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. Copy of Order and CM/ECF Registration forms mailed to Edward D. Johnson and Stephen E. Baskin This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. (Martin, Jan)
May 24, 2013 12 Motion to allow Stephen E. Baskin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3537314) filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Jones, Russell)
May 24, 2013 11 Motion to allow Edward D. Johnson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-3537293) filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc.. (Jones, Russell)
May 15, 2013 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Plaintiff Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC.(Dameron, Matthew)
May 15, 2013 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Defendant Google, Inc..(Jones, Russell)
May 6, 2013 8 NOTICE of appearance by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc. (Jones, Russell)
April 30, 2013 7 Rule 16 Notice. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/23/2013. Rule 26 conference due by 7/9/2013. Corporate disclosures due by 5/15/13. Signed on 4/30/2013 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Hopkins, Karen)
April 26, 2013 6 NOTICE of filing Notice of Related Cases by Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC (Dameron, Matthew)
April 25, 2013 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC. Google, Inc. served on 4/12/2013, answer due 6/3/2013. (Dameron, Matthew)
April 25, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is directed to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 6/3/2013. Signed on 4/25/13 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Hoberock, Meredith)
April 25, 2013 3 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Russell S. Jones, Jr on behalf of Google, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jones, Russell)
April 10, 2013 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/10/2013 as Document No. 3, Notice of EAP assignment to an outside mediator. The document was deleted as it was a duplicate filing to doc. 2. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Chorny, Traci)
April 10, 2013 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, Inc.. (Chorny, Traci)
April 10, 2013 2 Notice of EAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order)(Chorny, Traci)
April 10, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-3484532. Service due by 8/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dameron, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brilliant Optical Solutions LLC
Represented By: Norman Eli Siegel
Represented By: Paul A. Lesko
Represented By: Matthew Lee Dameron
Represented By: Sarah S. Burns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Heidrick
Represented By: Russell S. Jones, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]